NY A11255 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-15 - substituted by s8057
Status: Introduced on May 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-15 - substituted by s8057
Summary
To clarify that a surviving spouse's right of election under EPTL S5-1.1-A must be exercised within two years of the deceased's spouse's death, except that a court may, in its discretion for good cause shown, extend the time for a surviving spouse to exercise such right.
Title
Clarifies that a spouse's right of election must be made within two years of the deceased spouse's death.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-15 | substituted by s8057 | |
2010-06-14 | ordered to third reading rules cal.115 | |
2010-06-14 | rules report cal.115 | |
2010-06-14 | reported | |
2010-06-03 | reported referred to rules | |
2010-05-25 | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S08057 (Same As) 2010-10-01 - SIGNED CHAP.545
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A11255&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |