NY A11111 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-3)
Status: Passed on August 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-30 - signed chap.447
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-3)
Status: Passed on August 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-30 - signed chap.447
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
To better implement the Abandoned Infant Protection Act of 2000 by allowing individuals to abandon infants up to thirty days old and by providing that individuals who abandon their infants as prescribed by law will not be held criminally liable.
Title
Relates to abandoned infants and endangering the welfare of a child.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-30 | signed chap.447 | |
2010-08-18 | delivered to governor | |
2010-06-24 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-06-24 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-06-23 | 3RD READING CAL.1127 | |
2010-06-23 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2950D | |
2010-06-15 | REFERRED TO RULES | |
2010-06-15 | delivered to senate | |
2010-06-15 | passed assembly | |
2010-06-14 | ordered to third reading rules cal.112 | |
2010-06-14 | rules report cal.112 | |
2010-06-14 | reported | |
2010-06-03 | reported referred to rules | |
2010-05-17 | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S02950 (Same As) 2010-06-23 - SUBSTITUTED BY A11111