NY A11099 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - signed chap.417
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the energy storage deployment policy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the energy storage deployment policy.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Energy Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-21Senatesigned chap.417
2018-12-11Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-20SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-20Senate3RD READING CAL.2062
2018-06-20SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S8602A
2018-06-19SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2018-06-19Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-18Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.263
2018-06-18Assemblyrules report cal.263
2018-06-18Assemblyreported
2018-06-07Assemblyreported referred to rules
2018-06-05Assemblyreferred to energy

Same As/Similar To

S08602 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A11099

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A11099&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A11099&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A11099
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A11099&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A11099&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A11099&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A11099#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback