NY A11053 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-13 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-13 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the boards of education in union free school districts and central school districts to establish wards for the purpose of school board elections.
Title
Authorizes the boards of education in union free school districts and central school districts to establish wards for the purpose of school board elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 126 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.141 |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | rules report cal.141 |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-01 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S08920 (Same As) 2018-06-05 - REFERRED TO RULES