NY A11028 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-20 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to presumptions for the death of an injured worker due to opioid overdose where that injured worker was prescribed opioids as a result of his or her workplace injury.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to presumptions for the death of an injured worker due to opioid overdose where that injured worker was prescribed opioids as a result of his or her workplace injury.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 83 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2018-06-20Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-18Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.260
2018-06-18Assemblyrules report cal.260
2018-06-18Assemblyreported
2018-06-14Assemblyreported referred to rules
2018-06-05Assemblyreported referred to codes
2018-05-31Assemblyreferred to labor

Same As/Similar To

S08034 (Same As) 2018-03-21 - REFERRED TO LABOR

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A11028&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A11028&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A11028
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A11028&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A11028&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A11028&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A11028&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback