NY A11013 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-0)
Status: Introduced on May 30 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - ordered to third reading rules cal.202
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Exempts certain interested parties or people from civil arrest while going to, remaining at, or returning from the place of such court proceeding.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempts certain interested parties or people from civil arrest while going to, remaining at, or returning from the place of such court proceeding.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-13Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.202
2018-06-13Assemblyrules report cal.202
2018-06-13Assemblyreported
2018-06-05Assemblyreported referred to rules
2018-06-01Assemblyprint number 11013a
2018-06-01Assemblyamend and recommit to codes
2018-05-30Assemblyreferred to codes

Same As/Similar To

S08925 (Same As) 2018-06-05 - REFERRED TO RULES

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback