NY A11011 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8987a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8987a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to allowing for the use of medical marihuana as an alternative to opioids for pain management and substance use disorder.
Title
Relates to allowing for the use of medical marihuana as an alternative to opioids for pain management and substance use disorder.
Sponsors
Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] | Asm. Donna Lupardo [D] | Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D] | Asm. Harvey Epstein [D] |
Asm. Rafael Espinal [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s8987a |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | amended on third reading (t) 11011b |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.201 |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | rules report cal.201 |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | amend and recommit to rules 11011a |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S08987 (Same As) 2018-09-24 - SIGNED CHAP.273