NY A10975 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 5 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-22 - substituted by s7717
Status: Introduced on May 5 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-22 - substituted by s7717
Summary
Extends the authorization for the county of Herkimer to impose a county recording tax on obligation secured by a mortgage on real property until 2012.
Title
Extends the authorization for the county of Herkimer to impose a county recording tax on obligation secured by a mortgage on real property until 2012.
Sponsors
Asm. Marc Butler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-22 | substituted by s7717 | |
2010-06-22 | rules report cal.267 | |
2010-06-22 | reported | |
2010-06-21 | reported referred to rules | |
2010-05-05 | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S07717 (Same As) 2010-10-01 - SIGNED CHAP.542
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10975&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |