NY A10952 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-11 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-11 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to admission requirements for graduate-level teacher and educational leader programs.
Title
Relates to admission requirements for graduate-level teacher and educational leader programs.
Sponsors
Asm. Deborah Glick [D] | Asm. Donna Lupardo [D] | Asm. William Colton [D] | Asm. Erik Bohen [R] |
Asm. Harvey Epstein [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.76 |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | rules report cal.76 |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S08776 (Same As) 2018-05-16 - REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION