NY A10946 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 81-7)
Status: Passed on September 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-17 - signed chap.505
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires each polling place to be accessible to physically disabled voters and provides guidelines which shall be in accordance with the accessibility requirements mandated pursuant to the federal Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990, as amended.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires each polling place to be accessible to physically disabled voters and provides guidelines which shall be in accordance with the accessibility requirements mandated pursuant to the federal Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990, as amended.

Sponsors

Asm. Peter Abbate [D]Asm. Marc Alessi [D]Asm. Michael Benedetto [D]Asm. Michael Benjamin [D]
Asm. Jonathan Bing [D]Asm. William Boyland [D]Asm. James Brennan [D]Asm. Richard Brodsky [D]
Asm. Alec Brook-Krasny [D]Asm. Kevin Cahill [D]Asm. Nancy Calhoun [R]Asm. Ronald Canestrari [D]
Asm. Ann-Margaret Carrozza [D]Asm. Nelson Castro [D]Asm. Joan Christensen [D]Asm. Barbara Clark [D]
Asm. William Colton [D]Asm. Vivian Cook [D]Asm. Michael Cusick [D]Asm. Steven Cymbrowitz [D]
Asm. Francine DelMonte [D]Asm. Ro Ann Destito [D]Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D]Asm. Steven Englebright [D]
Sen. Adriano Espaillat [D]Asm. Herman Farrell [D]Asm. Ginny Fields [D]Asm. Gary Finch [R]
Asm. Dennis Gabryszak [D]Asm. Sandra Galef [D]Sen. Michael Gianaris [D]Asm. Deborah Glick [D]
Asm. Timothy Gordon [D]Asm. Richard Gottfried [D]Asm. Aileen Gunther [D]Asm. Carl Heastie [D]
Asm. Andrew Hevesi [D]Asm. Sam Hoyt [D]Asm. Rhoda Jacobs [D]Asm. Hakeem Jeffries [D]
Asm. Susan John [D]Sen. Brian Kavanagh [D]Asm. Micah Kellner [D]Asm. David Koon [D]
Sen. George Latimer [D]Asm. Charles Lavine [D]Asm. Joseph Lentol [D]Asm. Barbara Lifton [D]
Asm. Donna Lupardo [D]Asm. William Magee [D]Asm. William Magnarelli [D]Asm. Alan Maisel [D]
Asm. Margaret Markey [D]Asm. John McEneny [D]Asm. Michael Miller [D]Asm. Joan Millman [D]
Asm. Marcus Molinaro [R]Asm. Michael Montesano [R]Asm. Joseph Morelle [D]Asm. Felix Ortiz [D]
Asm. Amy Paulin [D]Asm. Crystal Peoples-Stokes [D]Asm. Nick Perry [D]Asm. Audrey Pheffer [D]
Asm. Gary Pretlow [D]Asm. Philip Ramos [D]Asm. Robert Reilly [D]Asm. Jose Rivera [D]
Asm. Peter Rivera [D]Asm. Annette Robinson [D]Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D]Asm. Teresa Sayward [R]
Asm. William Scarborough [D]Asm. Michelle Schimel [D]Asm. Mark Schroeder [D]Asm. Frank Skartados [D]
Asm. Michael Spano [R]Asm. Robert Sweeney [D]Asm. Fred Thiele [D]Asm. Matthew Titone [D]
Asm. Michele Titus [D]Asm. Darryl Towns [D]Asm. David Townsend [R]Asm. Helene Weinstein [D]
Asm. Harvey Weisenberg [D]Asm. David Weprin [D]Asm. Keith Wright [D]Asm. Kenneth Zebrowski [D]

Roll Calls

2010-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-09-17 signed chap.505
2010-09-07 delivered to governor
2010-06-10 RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2010-06-10 PASSED SENATE
2010-06-09 3RD READING CAL.940
2010-06-09 SUBSTITUTED FOR S7860
2010-05-17 REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
2010-05-17 delivered to senate
2010-05-17 passed assembly
2010-05-17 ordered to third reading rules cal.44
2010-05-17 rules report cal.44
2010-05-17 reported
2010-05-17 reported referred to rules
2010-05-12 reported referred to ways and means
2010-05-04 referred to election law

Same As/Similar To

S07860 (Same As) 2010-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10946

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback