NY A10939 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-13 - signed chap.369
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-13 - signed chap.369
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
This bill would repeal the Port Chester Community Development Agency that was originally established in 1964 pursuant to Title 37 of Article 15-B for the General Municipal Law as an urban renewal agency in the Village of Port Chester
Title
Repeals title 37 of article 15-B of the general municipal law relating to the establishment of the Port Chester community development agency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-13 | signed chap.369 | |
2010-08-03 | delivered to governor | |
2010-06-23 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-06-23 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-06-23 | HOME RULE REQUEST | |
2010-06-16 | 3RD READING CAL.921 | |
2010-06-16 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7755 | |
2010-06-15 | REFERRED TO RULES | |
2010-06-15 | delivered to senate | |
2010-06-15 | passed assembly | |
2010-06-15 | home rule request | |
2010-06-15 | ordered to third reading rules cal.157 | |
2010-06-15 | rules report cal.157 | |
2010-06-15 | reported | |
2010-06-15 | reported referred to rules | |
2010-05-25 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2010-05-04 | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S07755 (Same As) 2010-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10939