NY A10930 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 29 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-07 - ordered to third reading rules cal.75
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to professional misconduct by health care professionals in relation to the treatment or diagnosis of Lyme disease.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to professional misconduct by health care professionals in relation to the treatment or diagnosis of Lyme disease.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-07Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.75
2018-06-07Assemblyrules report cal.75
2018-06-06Assemblyreported
2018-06-05Assemblyreported referred to rules
2018-05-29Assemblyreferred to health

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback