NY A10927 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on May 29 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - substituted by s6655
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Directs the department of health to post on its website information relating to emerging contaminant notification levels and educational materials relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directs the department of health to post on its website information relating to emerging contaminant notification levels and educational materials relating thereto.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-13Assemblysubstituted by s6655
2018-06-12Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.135
2018-06-12Assemblyrules report cal.135
2018-06-11Assemblyreported
2018-06-05Assemblyreported referred to rules
2018-05-29Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S06655 (Same As) 2018-10-02 - SIGNED CHAP.314

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback