NY A10906 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-27 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-27 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the operation of games of chance by employees of authorized organizations.
Title
Relates to the operation of games of chance by employees of authorized organizations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-27 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2018-06-01 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
Same As/Similar To
S08313 (Same As) 2018-06-14 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY