NY A10903 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-07 - ordered to third reading rules cal.74
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-07 - ordered to third reading rules cal.74
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Ensures timely access to high-quality medical care; clarifies the appropriate use of medical treatment guidelines; requires access to addiction or dependency services.
Title
Ensures timely access to high-quality medical care; clarifies the appropriate use of medical treatment guidelines; requires access to addiction or dependency services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.74 |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | rules report cal.74 |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S08794 (Same As) 2018-05-18 - REFERRED TO LABOR