NY A10869 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-13 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-13 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to employee human trafficking recognition training and to authorizing the establishment of a standardized human trafficking recognition training program; requires public transportation services to require all employees to undergo a human-trafficking recognition training program established by the division of criminal justice services and the office of temporary and disability assistance in consultation with the department of transportation and the New York state interagency task force on human trafficking.
Title
Relates to employee human trafficking recognition training and to authorizing the establishment of a standardized human trafficking recognition training program; requires public transportation services to require all employees to undergo a human-trafficking recognition training program established by the division of criminal justice services and the office of temporary and disability assistance in consultation with the department of transportation and the New York state interagency task force on human trafficking.
Sponsors
Asm. Pamela Hunter [D] | Asm. Alicia Hyndman [D] | Asm. Jaime Williams [D] | Asm. Vivian Cook [D] |
Asm. Steven Otis [D] | Asm. Joseph Errigo [R] | Asm. Andrew Hevesi [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Social Services Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Social Services Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.133 |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | rules report cal.133 |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-05-24 | Assembly | referred to social services |
Same As/Similar To
A07725 (Same As) 2018-05-24 - enacting clause stricken