NY A10834 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-13 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-13 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes permanent certain provisions relating to the public library construction grant program.
Title
Makes permanent certain provisions relating to the public library construction grant program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Libraries And Education Technology Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Libraries And Education Technology Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.129 |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | rules report cal.129 |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-05-23 | Assembly | referred to libraries and education technology |