NY A10809 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-2)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-04 - amended on third reading 10809b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to informing maternity patients about the risks associated with cesarean section.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to informing maternity patients about the risks associated with cesarean section.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-04Assemblyamended on third reading 10809b
2018-05-31Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.1079
2018-05-31Assemblyreported
2018-05-22Assemblyprint number 10809a
2018-05-22Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to health
2018-05-18Assemblyreferred to health

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback