NY A10803 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on December 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-15 - approval memo.38
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on December 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-15 - approval memo.38
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the disposal of construction and demolition waste; provides penalties for the unlawful disposal and dealing in construction and demolition wastes; requires waste tracking documents for the disposal of construction and demolition waste; creates the crime of scheme to defraud by disposal of solid waste.
Title
Relates to the disposal of construction and demolition waste; provides penalties for the unlawful disposal and dealing in construction and demolition wastes; requires waste tracking documents for the disposal of construction and demolition waste; creates the crime of scheme to defraud by disposal of solid waste.
Sponsors
Asm. Steven Englebright [D] | Asm. Steve Stern [D] | Asm. Philip Ramos [D] | Asm. Judy Griffin [D] |
Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D] | Asm. Steven Otis [D] | Asm. Aileen Gunther [D] | Asm. Patricia Fahy [D] |
Asm. Doug Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-15 | Senate | approval memo.38 |
2020-12-15 | Senate | signed chap.332 |
2020-12-03 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-23 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-23 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1007 |
2020-07-23 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6758B |
2020-07-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.296 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | rules report cal.296 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | print number 10803a |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to rules |
2020-07-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-14 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2020-07-11 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S06758 (Same As) 2020-12-15 - approval memo.38