NY A10796 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-11 - signed chap.266
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-11 - signed chap.266
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Thomas Smith to receive credit under the optional twenty-year retirement plan of the retirement and social security law available to police officers.
Title
Authorizes Thomas Smith to receive credit under the optional twenty-year retirement plan of the retirement and social security law available to police officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-16 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-16 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-11 | Senate | signed chap.266 |
2020-10-30 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-22 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2020-07-22 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1003 |
2020-07-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8742 |
2020-07-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | home rule request |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.283 |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | rules report cal.283 |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-16 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2020-07-10 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S08742 (Same As) 2020-11-11 - signed chap.266