NY A10795 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-9)
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - signed chap.415
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Gives members of the New York state legislature the ability to solemnize marriages, provided that they shall not charge a fee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Gives members of the New York state legislature the ability to solemnize marriages, provided that they shall not charge a fee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 91 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-21Senatesigned chap.415
2018-12-11Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-20SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-20Senate3RD READING CAL.2058
2018-06-20SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S8298
2018-06-07SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2018-06-07Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-06-07Assemblypassed assembly
2018-05-31Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.1078
2018-05-31Assemblyreported
2018-05-18Assemblyreferred to judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S08298 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10795

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback