NY A10790 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - substituted by s8791a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - substituted by s8791a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the city of Albany to alienate certain lands used as parkland and to dedicate certain other lands as parklands.
Title
Authorizes the city of Albany to alienate certain lands used as parkland and to dedicate certain other lands as parklands.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Cities Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Cities Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s8791a |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.254 |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.254 |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | print number 10790a |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | amend and recommit to cities |
2018-05-18 | Assembly | referred to cities |
Same As/Similar To
S08791 (Same As) 2018-12-21 - SIGNED CHAP.450