NY A10786 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on November 20 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-11-20 - delivered to governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a Caumsett State Park fire readiness study to evaluate the adequacy and coverage of fire services within the park.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes a Caumsett State Park fire readiness study to evaluate the adequacy and coverage of fire services within the park.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-16 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-20Assemblydelivered to governor
2020-07-22SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2020-07-22SenatePASSED SENATE
2020-07-22Senate3RD READING CAL.939
2020-07-22SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S8652A
2020-07-21SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2020-07-21Assemblydelivered to senate
2020-07-21Assemblypassed assembly
2020-07-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.217
2020-07-20Assemblyrules report cal.217
2020-07-20Assemblyreported
2020-07-16Assemblyreported referred to rules
2020-07-14Assemblyprint number 10786a
2020-07-14Assemblyamend and recommit to governmental operations
2020-07-10Assemblyreferred to governmental operations

Same As/Similar To

S08652 (Same As) 2020-07-22 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10786A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A10786
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10786&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A10786
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10786&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A10786A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10786&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10786&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10786&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A10786#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback