NY A10784 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4)
Status: Vetoed on December 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-17 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to limits on certain supplementary insurance; permits insured to refuse supplementary insurance; requires certain disclaimer; relates to payments to durable medical equipment providers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to limits on certain supplementary insurance; permits insured to refuse supplementary insurance; requires certain disclaimer; relates to payments to durable medical equipment providers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-12-17Senatetabled
2012-12-17Senatevetoed memo.179
2012-12-05Assemblydelivered to governor
2012-06-21SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-21SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-06-21Senate3RD READING CAL.1426
2012-06-21SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S7787
2012-06-21SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2012-06-21Assemblydelivered to senate
2012-06-21Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.530
2012-06-20Assemblyrules report cal.530
2012-06-20Assemblyreported
2012-06-20Assemblyreported referred to rules
2012-06-20Assemblyreported referred to codes
2012-06-18Assemblyreferred to insurance

Same As/Similar To

S07787 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10784

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback