NY A10783 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-29 - signed chap.128
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-29 - signed chap.128
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to changing certain filing and submission date requirements for petitions brought before a town board.
Title
Relates to changing certain filing and submission date requirements for petitions brought before a town board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-16 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-16 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-29 | Senate | signed chap.128 |
2020-07-29 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-23 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-23 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.960 |
2020-07-23 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8763A |
2020-07-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.281 |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | rules report cal.281 |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | amend and recommit to rules 10783a |
2020-07-16 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-10 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S08763 (Same As) 2020-07-29 - signed chap.128