NY A10769 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-02 - VETOED MEMO.72
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-02 - VETOED MEMO.72
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the division for small-business to publish a small business compliance guide and post such guide to the division for small-business's website.
Title
Requires the division for small-business to publish a small business compliance guide and post such guide to the division for small-business's website.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-15 - Assembly - Assembly Small Business Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development And Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-15 - Assembly - Assembly Small Business Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development And Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-02 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.72 |
2020-11-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-07-21 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-07-21 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-07-21 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.216 |
2020-07-21 | Senate | substituted for a10769 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | referred to small business |
2020-03-11 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-03-11 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-03-10 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-03-04 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-03-03 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.532 |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
2019-11-15 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 6800A |
2019-11-15 | Assembly | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2019-10-23 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | substituted by s6800a |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.216 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.216 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-15 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-09 | Assembly | referred to small business |
Same As/Similar To
S06800 (Same As) 2020-12-02 - VETOED MEMO.72