NY A10754 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-10-12 - print number 10754a
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Enacts "Alix's law"; relates to leaving the scene of an incident without reporting it; also relates to operating a vehicle while under the influence of alcohol or drugs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts "Alix's law"; relates to leaving the scene of an incident without reporting it; also relates to operating a vehicle while under the influence of alcohol or drugs.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-10-12Assemblyprint number 10754a
2012-10-12Assemblyamend and recommit to transportation
2012-06-18Assemblyreferred to transportation

Same As/Similar To

S07577 (Same As) 2012-06-19 - referred to transportation
S07866 (Same As) 2012-11-14 - REFERRED TO RULES

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback