NY A10748 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-0)
Status: Introduced on April 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-24 - substituted by s7483a
Status: Introduced on April 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-24 - substituted by s7483a
Summary
To allow for community input on the impact of a hospital's closing on access to health care in the surround- ing community and require the department of health to identify the meas- ures which the department and other parties have taken or will take to ameliorate such impact.
Title
Enacts the "hospital closure planning act"; provides that whenever a general hospital closes, the commissioner of health shall within thirty days of being notified of such closure, hold a public hearing at a location within the geographic area served by such general hospital to solicit testimony concerning the extent to which such closure will result in the reduction or elimination of health care services in the affected community, and options and proposals for replacing or enhancing such health care services through other means in order to meet the needs of residents in the affected community; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-24 | substituted by s7483a | |
2010-06-24 | rules report cal.360 | |
2010-06-24 | reported | |
2010-06-24 | reported referred to rules | |
2010-06-15 | print number 10748a | |
2010-06-15 | amend and recommit to ways and means | |
2010-04-27 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2010-04-19 | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S07483 (Same As) 2010-10-01 - SIGNED CHAP.541
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10748&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |