NY A10731 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-17 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-17 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Grants uniform members of the bureau of fire prevention of the town of Islip peace officer status.
Title
Grants uniform members of the bureau of fire prevention of the town of Islip peace officer status.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-17 | Senate | tabled |
2012-12-17 | Senate | vetoed memo.178 |
2012-12-05 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2012-06-21 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-21 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1494 |
2012-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7721 |
2012-06-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.508 |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.508 |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S07721 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10731