NY A10729 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-4)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-18 - delivered to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-18 - delivered to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the confidentiality of clinical records.
Title
Relates to the confidentiality of clinical records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Mental Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Mental Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.192 |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | rules report cal.192 |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2018-05-16 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
Same As/Similar To
S05299 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES