NY A10722 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - signed chap.252
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - signed chap.252
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to membership in the New York state dental association.
Title
Relates to membership in the New York state dental association.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-24 | Senate | signed chap.252 |
2018-08-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-12 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-12 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1205 |
2018-06-12 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7930A |
2018-06-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.1075 |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | reported |
2018-05-15 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S07930 (Same As) 2018-06-12 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10722