NY A10719 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - signed chap.402
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the location for loading and unloading of bus passengers by an intercity bus; provides that the city agency shall consult with the port authority of New York and New Jersey if such location overlaps with an existing bus facility of such port authority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the location for loading and unloading of bus passengers by an intercity bus; provides that the city agency shall consult with the port authority of New York and New Jersey if such location overlaps with an existing bus facility of such port authority.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-08-17Senatesigned chap.402
2012-08-06Assemblydelivered to governor
2012-06-20SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-06-20SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2012-06-20Senate3RD READING CAL.1446
2012-06-20SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S7756
2012-06-20SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2012-06-20Assemblydelivered to senate
2012-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.529
2012-06-20Assemblyrules report cal.529
2012-06-20Assemblyreported
2012-06-20Assemblyreported referred to rules
2012-06-17Assemblyreferred to transportation

Same As/Similar To

S07756 (Same As) 2012-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10719

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback