NY A10702 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-11 - SIGNED CHAP.273
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-11 - SIGNED CHAP.273
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the functions of the chief administrator of the courts to include the compilation of certain data with respect to race/ethnicity, sex, sexual orientation, gender identity, veteran status, and disability status by specific jurisdiction; requires submission of an annual report of his or her findings.
Title
Expands the functions of the chief administrator of the courts to include the compilation of certain data with respect to race/ethnicity, sex, sexual orientation, gender identity, veteran status, and disability status by specific jurisdiction; requires submission of an annual report of his or her findings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-11 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.273 |
2020-10-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-07-23 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-07-23 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-07-23 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.337 |
2020-07-23 | Senate | substituted for a10702 |
2020-07-22 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.980 |
2020-02-25 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2020-02-10 | Assembly | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | substituted by s7703 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.337 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | rules report cal.337 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2020-07-01 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S07703 (Same As) 2020-11-11 - SIGNED CHAP.273