NY A10681 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - signed chap.170
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - signed chap.170
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the county of Suffolk to transfer and convey a portion of county parkland to the town of Southampton, county of Suffolk for continued park and recreational purposes and as a commercial fishing dock.
Title
Authorizes the county of Suffolk to transfer and convey a portion of county parkland to the town of Southampton, county of Suffolk for continued park and recreational purposes and as a commercial fishing dock.
Sponsors
Asm. Fred Thiele [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 125 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-31 | Senate | signed chap.170 |
2018-07-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-20 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-20 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2018-06-20 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1617 |
2018-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8658A |
2018-06-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | home rule request |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | home rule request |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.488 |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.488 |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | print number 10681a |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S08658 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10681A