NY A10650 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-5)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-19 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to authorizing additional paid leave for health related services for certain employees not employed by the state who served in a combat theater or combat zone of operations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to authorizing additional paid leave for health related services for certain employees not employed by the state who served in a combat theater or combat zone of operations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-19SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2018-06-19Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-18Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.285
2018-06-18Assemblyrules report cal.285
2018-06-18Assemblyreported
2018-06-18Assemblyreported referred to rules
2018-06-06Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2018-06-01Assemblyprint number 10650a
2018-06-01Assemblyamend and recommit to governmental operations
2018-05-10Assemblyreferred to governmental operations

Same As/Similar To

S08250 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
S09034 (Same As) 2018-06-14 - REFERRED TO RULES

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10650&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10650&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A10650
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10650&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A10650A
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10650&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10650&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10650&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10650&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback