NY A10637 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-21 - substituted by s7647
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-21 - substituted by s7647
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes town of Ellicottville, county of Cattaraugus to transfer funds from an unappropriated fund balance for the construction of a highway garage.
Title
Authorizes town of Ellicottville, county of Cattaraugus to transfer funds from an unappropriated fund balance for the construction of a highway garage.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-21 | Assembly | substituted by s7647 |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | rules report cal.553 |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | reported |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2012-06-12 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S07647 (Same As) 2012-08-17 - SIGNED CHAP.432