NY A10634 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-21 - signed chap.180
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to instilling mydriatic or cycloplegic eye drops by persons trained and deemed qualified by supervising licensed physicians or supervising licensed optometrists.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to instilling mydriatic or cycloplegic eye drops by persons trained and deemed qualified by supervising licensed physicians or supervising licensed optometrists.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-21Senatesigned chap.180
2020-09-16Assemblydelivered to governor
2020-07-22SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2020-07-22SenatePASSED SENATE
2020-07-22Senate3RD READING CAL.937
2020-07-22SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S8641A
2020-07-22SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2020-07-22Assemblydelivered to senate
2020-07-22Assemblypassed assembly
2020-07-21Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.274
2020-07-21Assemblyrules report cal.274
2020-07-21Assemblyreported
2020-07-14Assemblyreported referred to rules
2020-07-09Assemblyprint number 10634b
2020-07-09Assemblyamend and recommit to higher education
2020-06-24Assemblyprint number 10634a
2020-06-24Assemblyamend and recommit to higher education
2020-06-10Assemblyreferred to higher education

Same As/Similar To

S08641 (Same As) 2020-07-22 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10634B

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A10634
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10634&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A10634
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10634&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A10634A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10634&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A10634B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10634&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10634&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10634&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A10634#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback