NY A10624 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-1)
Status: Introduced on June 8 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-12 - substituted by s7638
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 8 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-12 - substituted by s7638
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a domestic violence fatality review team; adds members to the advisory council on domestic violence (part A); prohibits certain persons from controlling the disposition of a decedent's remains (part B); relates to the confidentiality program of the department of state (part C); relates to the consideration of certain factors when determining the issuance of an order of recognizance or bail and establishes the crime of aggravated domestic violence (part D); relates to a reasonable request to receive communications of health information by alternative means where disclosure could endanger a person (part E).
Title
Establishes a domestic violence fatality review team; adds members to the advisory council on domestic violence (part A); prohibits certain persons from controlling the disposition of a decedent's remains (part B); relates to the confidentiality program of the department of state (part C); relates to the consideration of certain factors when determining the issuance of an order of recognizance or bail and establishes the crime of aggravated domestic violence (part D); relates to a reasonable request to receive communications of health information by alternative means where disclosure could endanger a person (part E).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-12 | Assembly | substituted by s7638 |
2012-06-12 | Assembly | rules report cal.144 |
2012-06-12 | Assembly | reported |
2012-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2012-06-08 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S07638 (Same As) 2012-10-25 - SIGNED CHAP.491