NY A10615 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-07 - signed chap.368
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-07 - signed chap.368
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to permitted deductions from wages; extends the effectiveness of such provisions.
Title
Relates to permitted deductions from wages; extends the effectiveness of such provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-07 | Senate | signed chap.368 |
2018-11-26 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-19 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-19 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1975 |
2018-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8834 |
2018-06-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.1069 |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2018-05-09 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S08834 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10615