NY A10614 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to disability benefits for firefighters employed by the division of military and naval affairs.
Title
Relates to disability benefits for firefighters employed by the division of military and naval affairs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-28 | Senate | tabled |
2016-11-28 | Senate | vetoed memo.261 |
2016-11-16 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-16 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-16 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1950 |
2016-06-16 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8071 |
2016-06-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.470 |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | rules report cal.470 |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S08071 (Same As) 2016-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10614