NY A10593 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-03 - signed chap.474
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that certain tax credits shall not apply if the certificate of remediation required to qualify for such credits is issued after December 31, 2015.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that certain tax credits shall not apply if the certificate of remediation required to qualify for such credits is issued after December 31, 2015.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-10-03Senatesigned chap.474
2012-09-21Assemblydelivered to governor
2012-06-21SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-21SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-06-21Senate3RD READING CAL.1522
2012-06-21SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S7788
2012-06-18SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2012-06-18Assemblydelivered to senate
2012-06-18Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-14Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.278
2012-06-14Assemblyrules report cal.278
2012-06-14Assemblyreported
2012-06-13Assemblyreported referred to rules
2012-06-07Assemblyreferred to ways and means

Same As/Similar To

S07788 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10593

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback