NY A10592 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on October 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-03 - signed chap.473
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to rates for pilotage on Long Island Sound and Block Island Sound.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to rates for pilotage on Long Island Sound and Block Island Sound.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-10-03Senatesigned chap.473
2012-09-21Assemblydelivered to governor
2012-06-20SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-06-20SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2012-06-20Senate3RD READING CAL.1435
2012-06-20SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S6526A
2012-06-20SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2012-06-20Assemblydelivered to senate
2012-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.524
2012-06-20Assemblyrules report cal.524
2012-06-20Assemblyreported
2012-06-20Assemblyreported referred to rules
2012-06-20Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2012-06-07Assemblyreferred to transportation

Same As/Similar To

S06526 (Same As) 2012-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10592

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback