NY A10591 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - signed chap.399
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - signed chap.399
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the federal electronic fund transfer act; clarifies the relationship between such act and article 4-A of the UCC.
Title
Relates to the federal electronic fund transfer act; clarifies the relationship between such act and article 4-A of the UCC.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-17 | Senate | signed chap.399 |
2012-08-06 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2012-06-19 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-19 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1372 |
2012-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7493A |
2012-06-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.277 |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.277 |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2012-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2012-06-07 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S07493 (Same As) 2012-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10591