NY A10588 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on May 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-13 - print number 10588b
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-13 - print number 10588b
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to allowing for facility caregivers to possess medical marihuana in a similar manner to that of a designated caregiver; relates to medical marihuana research.
Title
Relates to allowing for facility caregivers to possess medical marihuana in a similar manner to that of a designated caregiver; relates to medical marihuana research.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | Assembly | print number 10588b |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2018-05-23 | Assembly | print number 10588a |
2018-05-23 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to health |
2018-05-08 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S08148 (Same As) 2018-06-14 - PRINT NUMBER 8148A