NY A10583 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-17 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Extends crossbow hunting provisions through 2014.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extends crossbow hunting provisions through 2014.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-12-17Senatetabled
2012-12-17Senatevetoed memo.177
2012-12-05Assemblydelivered to governor
2012-06-21SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-21SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-06-21Senate3RD READING CAL.1491
2012-06-21SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S7705A
2012-06-21SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2012-06-21Assemblydelivered to senate
2012-06-21Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-18Assemblyamended on third reading 10583a
2012-06-14Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.276
2012-06-14Assemblyrules report cal.276
2012-06-14Assemblyreported
2012-06-13Assemblyreported referred to rules
2012-06-07Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation

Same As/Similar To

S07705 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10583A

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback