NY A10576 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-01 - signed chap.338
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-01 - signed chap.338
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the building inspector in the town of Cambria, county of Niagara, to reside outside such town, but within the county or an adjoining county.
Title
Authorizes the building inspector in the town of Cambria, county of Niagara, to reside outside such town, but within the county or an adjoining county.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-01 | Senate | signed chap.338 |
2012-07-20 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2012-06-19 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-19 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1339 |
2012-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7593 |
2012-06-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.274 |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.274 |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2012-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2012-06-06 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S07593 (Same As) 2012-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10576