NY A10574 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-18 - substituted by s6343a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-18 - substituted by s6343a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to theft of services from barbershops, salons or beauty salons and makes such offense a violation.
Title
Relates to theft of services from barbershops, salons or beauty salons and makes such offense a violation.
Sponsors
Asm. Alicia Hyndman [D] | Asm. Jose Rivera [D] | Asm. Marcos Crespo [D] | Asm. Inez Dickens [D] |
Asm. Sandra Galef [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s6343a |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.233 |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.233 |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S06343 (Same As) 2018-09-25 - SIGNED CHAP.275