NY A10563 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Credits any on-premises licensees or any manufacturing licensee with on-premises retail privileges for each day they were unable to operate due to COVID-19; provides that such credits shall be used for such licensee's license renewal; provides for the repeal of such provisions upon expiration thereof.
Title
Credits any on-premises licensees or any manufacturing licensee with on-premises retail privileges for each day they were unable to operate due to COVID-19; provides that such credits shall be used for such licensee's license renewal; provides for the repeal of such provisions upon expiration thereof.
Sponsors
Asm. Marianne Buttenschon [D] | Asm. Edward Braunstein [D] | Asm. Michael Cusick [D] | Asm. Judy Griffin [D] |
Asm. Inez Dickens [D] | Asm. Steven Otis [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.210 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.210 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-13 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2020-07-08 | Assembly | print number 10563a |
2020-07-08 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to economic development |
2020-06-03 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S08452 (Same As) 2020-07-09 - PRINT NUMBER 8452A