NY A10558 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - signed chap.469
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - signed chap.469
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the nineteen member autism spectrum disorders advisory board.
Title
Establishes the nineteen member autism spectrum disorders advisory board.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-28 | Senate | signed chap.469 |
2016-11-16 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-15 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-15 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1858 |
2016-06-15 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8036A |
2016-06-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.380 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.380 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-06-10 | Assembly | print number 10558a |
2016-06-10 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-06-03 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
Same As/Similar To
S08036 (Same As) 2016-06-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10558A