NY A10553 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 28 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-07-08 - print number 10553b
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Imposes a temporary ban on the commencement of mortgage foreclosure actions and the sale of foreclosed properties for 365 days after the last region or county enters into phase 3 of the governor's reopening plan relating to the COVID-19 pandemic.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Imposes a temporary ban on the commencement of mortgage foreclosure actions and the sale of foreclosed properties for 365 days after the last region or county enters into phase 3 of the governor's reopening plan relating to the COVID-19 pandemic.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-08Assemblyprint number 10553b
2020-07-08Assemblyamend and recommit to judiciary
2020-07-01Assemblyprint number 10553a
2020-07-01Assemblyamend and recommit to judiciary
2020-05-28Assemblyreferred to judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S08445 (Same As) 2020-06-26 - PRINT NUMBER 8445B

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback